VA HJR73 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Interstate 66 Corridor Improvement Plan. Requests the Commonwealth Transportation Board to study safety, congestion, and tolling concerns on Interstate 66 and to develop and adopt an Interstate 66 Corridor Improvement Plan.
Title
Interstate 66; CTB to study safety, congestion, etc., concerns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103256D |