VA HJR754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the lives and legacies of Allie Thompson, William Grayson, and William Thompson.
Title
Commemorating the lives and legacies of Allie Thompson, William Grayson, and William Thompson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-28 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19104591D |