VA HJR767 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ767ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Elizabeth Carter Lineweaver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Elizabeth Carter Lineweaver.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ767ER)
2019-02-18SenateAgreed to by Senate
2019-02-05SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-05SenateReceived
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-29HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19103594D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback