VA HJR77 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding for two additional years, through the 2021 interim.
Title
Coastal Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; continued, appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HJ102-Hodges) by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101439D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ102 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ102ER)
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HJ77 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HJ77+hil |