VA HJR821 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ821ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ821ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Michael J. Brown.
Title
Commending Michael J. Brown.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Les Adams [R] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ821ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-11 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-05 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19105459D |