VA HJR824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Taywin Boonjindasap.
Title
Commending Taywin Boonjindasap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules pursuant to House Rule 39(a) |
2019-02-05 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19104234D |