VA HJR856 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Oanh Pham Kim Dang.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Oanh Pham Kim Dang.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateLeft in Rules
2019-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-12SenateReading waived
2019-02-11HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-07HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19105710D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback