VA HR217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Study; staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation at the Virginia Department of Corrections; report. Directs the House Committees on Health, Welfare and Institutions and Militia and Police to establish a joint committee to study staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation at the Virginia Department of Corrections. The joint committee shall conclude its work by November 30, 2019, and shall report its findings and recommendations no later than the first day of the 2020 Regular Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VDC; staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19104427D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback