VA SB1003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1178)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1178)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Computer crimes; monetary harm; penalty. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who, without the intent to receive any direct or indirect benefit, maliciously sends an electronically transmitted communication containing a false representation intended to cause another person to spend money, and such false representation causes such person to spend money. Computer crimes; monetary harm; penalty. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who, without the intent to receive any direct or indirect benefit, maliciously sends an electronically transmitted communication containing a false representation intended to cause another person to spend money, and such false representation causes such person to spend money.
Title
Computer crimes; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 10-N) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 10-N) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1178) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1178 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1003ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 20109088D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (86-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1003H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20109088D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109088D-H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1003S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108067D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108067D-S1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104493D |