VA SB1004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wildlife Corridor Action Plan; road construction projects. Directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries, in collaboration with the Department of Transportation and the Department of Conservation and Recreation, to create a Wildlife Corridor Action Plan (the Plan). The Plan shall identify wildlife corridors, defined as areas connecting fragmented wildlife habitats that are separated by human activities or infrastructure, and recommend wildlife crossing projects intended to promote driver safety and wildlife connectivity. The bill requires the Plan to be submitted to the Chairs of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by September 1, 2022, and every four years thereafter. The bill also provides that the Department of Transportation shall (i) include the impact on any wildlife corridor identified in the Plan in any environmental impact report for a highway construction project and (ii) consider measures for the mitigation of harm caused to wildlife by a highway in the design options for the construction of such highway.
Title
Wildlife Corridor Action Plan; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1004ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (90-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105261D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Same As/Similar To
HB1695 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1188.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 578 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 579 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |