VA SB1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School calendar; opening day of the school year. Requires each local school board to set the school calendar so that the first day students are required to attend school is no earlier than 14 days before Labor Day unless the Board of Education waives such requirement for good cause. Under current law, each local school board is required to set the school calendar so that the first day students are required to attend school is after Labor Day unless the Board of Education waives such requirement for good cause. The bill provides that in each school division in which the school board sets the school calendar so that the first day students are required to attend school is before Labor Day, such school board shall close each school in the school division from the Friday immediately preceding Labor Day through Labor Day. The bill exempts from certain requirements certain school boards that were previously granted good cause waivers by the Board of Education. This bill is identical to HB 1652.
Title
School calendar; opening day of the school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1005ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed House (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee substitute rejected 19106643D-H1 |
2019-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106643D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1005S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106259D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1113 (Favola) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1074 (Howell) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106259D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100072D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |