VA SB1012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-24 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-24 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a concealed handgun; firefighters and
Title
Firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, etc.; carrying a concealed weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Rereferred to Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1012S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105018D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105018D-S1 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100066D |