VA SB1012 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax subtraction for certain low-income and middle-income students. Establishes an individual income tax subtraction starting in taxable year 2021 for any financial assistance received by a student through the Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back Program, which was included in the Governor's introduced budget and would offer financial assistance to low-income and middle-income Virginia residents. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for certain low-income and middle-income students, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104967D-E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1012E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104967D |