VA SB1015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits; pre-kindergarten eligibility. Expands the Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits program by including, as eligible scholarship recipients, children enrolled in or attending nonpublic pre-kindergarten programs whose parents or guardians were unable to obtain services for the children through the Virginia Preschool Initiative. The maximum annual scholarship that a child admitted to, enrolled in, or attending a nonpublic pre-kindergarten program will receive is the lesser of the child's actual educational expenses or the state's share of the grant per child under the Virginia Preschool Initiative for the locality in which the child resides.
Title
Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits; pre-kindergarten eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 817 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1015ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (56-Y 42-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19100091D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1015E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 5-N) |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100091D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |