VA SB1015 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of marijuana; cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil. Provides that a person who possesses marijuana in the form of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil pursuant to a valid written certification issued by a practitioner in the course of his professional practice shall not prosecuted for simple possession of marijuana. The bill also provides that no agent or employee of a pharmaceutical processor shall be prosecuted for possession or manufacture of marijuana or for possession, manufacture, or distribution of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil, or subject to any civil penalty, denied any right or privilege, or subject to any disciplinary action by a professional licensing board if such agent or employee (i) possessed or manufactured such marijuana for the purposes of producing cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil or (ii) possessed, manufactured, or distributed such cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil in accordance with law. Current law provides that such possession of marijuana in the form of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil in such circumstances is an affirmative defense to such charges.
Title
Marijuana; possession of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1015ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1015S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107741D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107741D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20105511D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105511D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |