VA SB1018 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Redistricting; Geographic Information System maps required; review by the Department of Elections. Requires the clerk of the county, city, or town to send a Geographic Information System (GIS) map, along with the ordinance containing a description of the boundaries, to the local electoral board, the Secretary of the Commonwealth, the Department of Elections, and the Division of Legislative Services when redistricting local election districts or making any changes to the local election districts or precincts. If a county, city, or town does not have GIS capabilities, the locality may request the Department of Elections to create a GIS map on its behalf and the Department of Elections shall create such a map. The bill requires the Department to review any ordinance and GIS map received and compare the boundaries contained within with the information in the voter registration system to ensure voters have been assigned to the correct districts and to notify localities of any corrections that may be necessary. The Department is further required to maintain and make available on its official website maps showing the current election district and precinct boundaries of each county and city. This bill is identical to HB 2760.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting; GIS maps required, review by the Department of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1018ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106690D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1018H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106690D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106690D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100071D-E
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1018E
2019-01-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-25SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-15SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2018-08-22SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-08-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100071D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1018
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1018+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1018E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1018H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1018ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0778+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0056+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0091+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1018+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0201SB1018+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0182+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2691+SB1018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0670SB1018+SB1018

Bill Comments

feedback