VA SB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; additional retirement allowance; retirement age. Changes the age through which a retired law-enforcement officer covered under the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System (VaLORS) is entitled to receive an additional retirement allowance from the law-enforcement officer's sixty-fifth birthday to retirement age as defined by the Social Security Act. This change aligns the additional allowance with that currently provided under the State Police Officers' Retirement System. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; additional retirement allowance, retirement age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1019S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107003D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107003D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB554 (Ruff) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20105177D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105177D |
Same As/Similar To
SB554 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations