VA SB1023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to continue to receive his service retirement allowance during a subsequent period of employment by a local school division as a school security officer. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriations act. The bill incorporates SB 1203 and SB 1582.
Title
VRS; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] | Sen. Benton Chafin [R] |
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104938D-ES1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1023ES1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Cosgrove agreed to |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1023S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104938D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB1582 (Suetterlein) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB1203 (Stuart) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104938D-S1 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100662D |