VA SB1024 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; DCJS; exemption. Provides an exemption from the Administrative Process Act for the Department of Criminal Justice Services whenever the Department develops, issues, or revises any training standards approved by the Criminal Justice Services Board.
Title
Administrative Process Act; exemption for Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 780 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1024ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1024ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102148D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Criminal Procedure
Governor
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Criminal Procedure
Governor