VA SB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying dangerous weapon to place of religious worship. Repeals the statutory prohibition on carrying a gun, pistol, bowie knife, dagger, or other dangerous weapon, without good and sufficient reason, to a place of worship while a meeting for religious purposes is being held at such place.
Title
Place of religious worship; carrying dangerous weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100172D |