VA SB1026 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0886)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0886)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Care of agricultural animals by owner; penalty. Provides standards of care specifically for agricultural animals that ensure accommodation for customary farming activities. An owner of an agricultural animal is required to provide feed to prevent malnourishment, water to prevent dehydration and veterinary treatment as needed to address impairment of health or bodily function when such impairment cannot be otherwise addressed through animal husbandry. The bill also clarifies certain procedures for the seizure and impoundment of agricultural animals. It allows agricultural animals whose owner has not met the new adequate care standards to be sold by a local governing body.
Title
Agricultural animals; care by owner, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 29-N) (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0886) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 886 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 29-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1026ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed House (88-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1026S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Amendment by Senator McEachin withdrawn | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104902D-S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104902D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101689D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Same As) 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |