VA SB1026 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacists; initiating treatment, dispensing, and administering of controlled substances. Includes in the practice of pharmacy initiating treatment, dispensing, and administering of certain drugs and devices by a pharmacist, provided that such pharmacist initiates treatment with, dispenses, or administers such drugs and devices in accordance with a statewide protocol developed by the Board of Pharmacy in collaboration with the Board of Medicine and Department of Health and set forth in regulations of the Board of Pharmacy. The bill clarifies that an accident and sickness insurance policy that provides reimbursement for a service that may be legally performed by a licensed pharmacist shall provide reimbursement for initiating treatment with, dispensing, or administering drugs and devices by a pharmacist when such initiation of treatment, dispensation, or administration is in accordance with regulations of the Board of Pharmacy. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 280 days of its effective date. The Board shall report to the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the Chairman of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions by November 1, 2020, on the status of the regulations. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Pharmacists; initiating treatment, dispensing, and administering of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Sen. Todd Pillion [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] | Sen. Benton Chafin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1026S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107661D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107661D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20105432D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105432D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |