VA SB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; catastrophic health plans. Authorizes health carriers to offer catastrophic plans on the individual market and to offer such plans to all individuals. The measure provides that a catastrophic plan is deemed to provide an essential health benefits package and to meet certain requirements of federal law. A catastrophic plan is a high-deductible health care plan that provides essential health benefits and coverage for at least three primary care visits per policy year. Under the federal Affordable Care Act, catastrophic plans satisfy requirements that health benefit plans provide minimum levels of coverage only if they cover individuals who are under 30 years of age or who qualify for a hardship exemption or affordability exemption. The measure requires the Commissioner of Insurance to apply to the federal government for a state innovation waiver allowing the implementation of the provision. The provision will become effective 30 days after the Commissioner notifies certain persons that the request has been approved. This bill is identical to HB 2260.
Title
Health insurance; catastrophic health plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 16-N) |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1027ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100753D |