VA SB1029 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; gourmet shop license; distiller participation in tastings. Allows distillers to participate in tastings held by gourmet shop licensees.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; gourmet shop license, distiller participation in tastings.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1179) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1179 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1029ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (91-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105624D-E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1029E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: ABC |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20105624D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105624D |