VA SB1031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, corporations providing health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder under insurance policies, subscription contracts, or health care plans issued in the individual market or small group markets. The existing requirement that such coverage be provided for policies, contracts, or plans issued in the large group market is not affected. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2021.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder, individual and small group markets, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102988D-E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1031E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20102988D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1503 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)