VA SB1048 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special conservators of the peace; museums of the Commonwealth. Authorizes any museum owned and managed by the Commonwealth to apply for the appointment by the circuit court of a special conservator of the peace.
Title
Conservators of the peace, special; any State museum to apply for appointment by circuit court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1048ER) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13102726D-E |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1048E |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102726D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2058 (Same As) 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)