VA SB1048 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Death certificate; amendments. Establishes a process for amending death certificates to change the name of the deceased, the deceased's parent or spouse, or the informant; the marital status of the deceased; or the place of residence of the deceased when the place of residence is outside the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 2276.
Title
Death certificate; amendments other than correction of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1048ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title replaced 17105319D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1048H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105319D-H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105319D-H1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1048S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104643D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104643D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101039D |
Subjects
Affidavits
Birth and Death Records
Circuit Courts
Counties Cities and Towns
Courts of Record
Health
Oaths Affirmations and Bonds
Records Retention
Birth and Death Records
Circuit Courts
Counties Cities and Towns
Courts of Record
Health
Oaths Affirmations and Bonds
Records Retention