VA SB1048 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase of handguns or other weapons; auxiliary law-enforcement officers. Eliminates the requirement that a sheriff or local police department seek written authorization or approval from the local governing body before allowing an auxiliary law-enforcement officer with more than 10 years of service to purchase the service handgun issued to him by the agency at a price that is equivalent to or less than fair market value.
Title
Auxiliary law-enforcement officers; purchase of service handguns or other weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1048ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100661D |