VA SB1061 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; electronic pollbooks; photographs. Requires electronic pollbooks to contain a photograph and identifying information received by the State Board of Elections from the Department of Motor Vehicles for each registered voter for whom the Department of Motor Vehicles has such a photograph and identifying information. Lists of voters furnished pursuant to current law are prohibited from containing any voter's photograph or identifying physical information. The bill also provides that if the electronic pollbook contains the voter's photograph and identifying information, the officer of election is required to access that photograph and identifying information and the voter is not required to present one of the statutorily required forms of identification. Additionally, the bill requires the officer of election to challenge the voter's vote if the voter does not appear to be the same person depicted in the photograph or in the pollbook. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic pollbooks; photographs and identifying information for each voter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseLeft in Appropriations
2015-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2015-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-13HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 6-N)
2015-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2015-02-06HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2015-02-06HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-03SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-03SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
2015-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1061S2
2015-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 15104676D-S2
2015-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected 15104321D-S1
2015-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-02SenateRead second time
2015-02-02SenateFloor substitute printed 15104676D-S2 (Obenshain)
2015-01-30SenatePassed by for the day
2015-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-27SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2015-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 15104321D-S1
2015-01-22SenateAssigned to P&E sub: Campaigns
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2015-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100744D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242404(n/a)See Bill Text
242611(n/a)See Bill Text
242643(n/a)See Bill Text
242651(n/a)See Bill Text
462208.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB1061
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1061+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1061S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1061S2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S08V0054+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0160SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0210SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0212SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0213SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1804V0032+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H18V0130+SB1061

Bill Comments

feedback