VA SB1061 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; exemption for sheriff's departments. Adds an exemption to the Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act (§ 2.2-3800 et seq.) for personal information systems maintained by sheriff's departments of counties and cities that deal with investigations and intelligence gathering relating to criminal activity and limits the existing exemptions for personal information systems maintained by the Department of State Police, police departments of localities and of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Tunnel Commission, and sheriff's departments to those personal information systems that deal with investigations and intelligence gathering related to criminal activity. The bill contains technical amendments. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; exemption for sheriff's departments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
2017-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 3/24/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1061ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-22SenateTitle replaced 17105526D-H1
2017-02-22SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1061H1
2017-02-21HouseEmergency clause added
2017-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105526D-H1
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105526D-H1
2017-02-16HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-02-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-07SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 17100725D-E
2017-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1061E
2017-02-07SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-07SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-07SenateRead second time
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100725D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223802(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1061
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1061+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1061E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1061H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1061ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0702+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0098+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0331SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0393SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0395SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1102V0061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0225+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2519+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0827SB1061+SB1061

Bill Comments

feedback