VA SB1079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; exemptions. Eliminates the exemptions to Virginia's minimum wage requirements for newsboys, shoe-shine boys, babysitters who work 10 hours or more per week, ushers, doormen, concession attendants, and cashiers in theaters. The measure contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to HB 2473.
Title
Minimum wage; exemptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1079ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Title replaced 19106588D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (84-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1079H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106588D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106588D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1079S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Howell agreed to 19104912D-S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 19104912D-S1 (Howell) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102096D |