VA SB1080 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Superintendent of Public Instruction; Urban Teacher Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Urban Teacher Fund and Program, to be administered by the Superintendent of Public Instruction, for the purpose of providing grants to persons employed in urban school divisions with teacher shortages who remain employed by the urban school division for a period of at least five years.
Title
Urban Teacher Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108348D-H1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105428D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote