VA SB1089 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority; payments to the City of Hampton in lieu of real property taxes. Provides that, for real estate leased by the Fort Monroe Authority (the Authority) to a private owner, such real estate shall be taxed by the City of Hampton as if it were privately owned and billed directly to the lessee. However, if the lease term is less than 20 years, Hampton shall bill the Authority. The bill provides that the Authority and its lessees may use existing procedures for contesting assessments and taxes. Current law provides that land owned by the Authority is subject to a fee in lieu of real property taxes, but is silent on the treatment of land leased by the Authority to a private party. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to HB 1965.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority; payments to the City of Hampton in lieu of real property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1089ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1089S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105320D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105320D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102827D |