VA SB1089 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Visiting state correctional facilities; strip searches of those entering. Provides that no child under the age of 18 who is seeking entrance to a state correctional facility shall be strip searched or subjected to a search of any body cavity under any circumstances. The bill also provides that the Department may not permanently ban any person, or insinuate that any person will be permanently banned, from seeking entrance to a state correctional facility on the basis of such person's refusal to consent to a strip search or a search of any body cavity when such person is seeking to enter the interior of any state correctional facility. The bill provides that the Department may deny such person entry to the facility, unless otherwise provided by law, but may not deny such person any future entry on the basis of a prior refusal to consent.
Title
Correctional facilities, state; strip searches of those entering a facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1181) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1181 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1089ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109660D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-04 | House | Delegates: Carter, Scott, Bell |
2020-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Morrissey, Peake, Boysko |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1089H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108805D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108805D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20106053D-E |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1089E |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20106053D |