VA SB1091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Site plan approval; decommissioning certified solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices. Requires a locality, as part of the local legislative approval process or as a condition of approval of a site plan, to require an owner, lessee, or developer of real property to enter into a written agreement to decommission solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices upon certain terms and conditions, including right of entry by the locality and financial assurance. This bill incorporates SB 1398 and is identical to HB 2621.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rezoning and site plan approval; decommissioning solar energy equipment, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 744 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1091ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1091S2
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105928D-S2
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105606D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateIncorporates SB1398 (Stanley)
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105928D-S2
2019-01-29SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Local Government
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105606D-S1
2018-12-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-19SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100804D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1091
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1091+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1091S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1091S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1091ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0744+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0092+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0042+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1091+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0063+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2645+SB1091
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0563SB1091+SB1091

Bill Comments

feedback