VA SB1093 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Literary Fund; school modernization. Requires the Board of Education to create a program in which monies from the Literary Fund would be used to subsidize interest payments by local governing bodies and school boards on certain loans from the Virginia Public School Authority for school construction and modernization. Only school divisions with a composite index of local ability-to-pay less than 0.4000 would be eligible to participate in the interest payment program. The bill limits the aggregate amount of loans for each fiscal year to an amount to be specified in the general appropriation act.
Title
Literary Fund; school modernization.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2019-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1093ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19107308D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1093H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19107308D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19107308D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1093S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105361D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105361D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 19103774D |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103774D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 146.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6513.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 199 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |