VA SB11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local disposable plastic bag tax. Authorizes any county or city, beginning no earlier than January 1, 2021, to impose a tax of five cents per bag on disposable plastic bags provided to consumers by certain retailers, with certain bags being exempt from the tax. The bill allows every retailer that collects the tax to retain a portion of the five-cent tax and provides that the revenue accruing to the county or city shall be used for certain purposes including environmental cleanup and the provision of reusable bags. The measure authorizes the Tax Commissioner to administer the tax.
Title
Disposable plastic bags; local tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1023) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1023 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB11ER) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (51-Y 46-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109452D-S3 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: Carr, Lopez, Ware |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Ebbin, McClellan, Vogel |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (52-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB11H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendments by Delegate Watts agreed to |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108637D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108637D-H1 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB11S2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 20108122D-S2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20108122D-S1 (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20108122D-S2 (Newman) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107539D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB198 (Locke) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB26 (Petersen) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100728D |
Same As/Similar To
SB26 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB198 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
HB534 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1022)
SB198 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
HB534 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1022)