VA SB1107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disorderly conduct in public places; school activities. Eliminates the Class 1 misdemeanor for disrupting willfully or while intoxicated, whether willfully or not, the operation of any school or any school activity conducted or sponsored by any school, if the disruption (i) prevents or interferes with the orderly conduct of the operation or activity or (ii) has a direct tendency to cause acts of violence by the person or persons at whom, individually, the disruption is directed.
Title
Disorderly conduct in public places; school activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101854D |