VA SB1110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; local referendums. Allows the sale of mixed beverages by licensed restaurants and the sale of alcoholic beverages by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority in any county, town, or supervisor's election district unless a referendum is held and a majority of the voters voting in such referendum vote to prohibit such sales. Under current law, such sales are prohibited unless they have been approved through the referendum process. The bill includes a grandfathering provision that allows the granting of a mixed beverage license to any establishment described in ?§4.1-126, as it was in effect prior to the effective date of this bill, notwithstanding the provisions of the bill related to local referendums but subject to other applicable laws and regulations. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020, but allows localities to hold anticipatory referendums between July 1, 2019, and June 30, 2020, and provides that the results of such referendums shall become valid and enforceable on July 1, 2020. The bill provides that the result of any referendum held prior to July 1, 2019, shall remain valid and enforceable for a period of five years. This bill is identical to HB 2634.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; local referendums.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1110ER) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (66-Y 32-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1110S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104915D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104915D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100982D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |