VA SB1121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Maximum number of judges in each judicial district. Increases from 11 to 12 the maximum number of authorized general district court judgeships in the nineteenth judicial district. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Judges; maximum number in nineteenth judicial district.
Sponsors
Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102862D |