VA SB1126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming; penalties. Authorizes casino gaming in the Commonwealth to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board (the Board). Casino gaming shall be limited to certain cities that meet the criteria that is outlined in the bill, and a referendum must be passed in the city on the question of allowing casino gaming in the city. The bill requires the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to conduct a review of casino gaming laws in other states and report its findings to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on General Laws on or before December 1, 2019. The bill contains enactment clauses that prohibit (i) any referendum from being held prior to the publication of the JLARC findings and recommendations regarding casino gaming or after January 1, 2021, and (ii) the Board from issuing a license to operate a gaming operation before July 1, 2020. The bill also provides that amendments to the Code of Virginia that are made in the bill will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming, penalties, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 27-N) (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 27-N) (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789) | |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 789 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1126ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (64-Y 33-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 33-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 27-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 27-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 19107709D-S3 |
2019-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-13 | House | Delegates: Peace, Gilbert, Jones, S.C., Plum |
2019-02-13 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Lucas, Sturtevant |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (67-Y 31-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (67-Y 31-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1126H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106846D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106846D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105946D-ES2 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1126ES2 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105946D-S2 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 19105340D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105946D-S2 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Incorporates SB1706 (Lewis) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Incorporates SB1503 (Carrico) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105340D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103689D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 364 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |