VA SB1130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; school resource officers; school administrators; training. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services (Department) to establish, and every full-time or part-time law-enforcement officer employed as a school resource officer after July 1, 2020, to comply with, compulsory minimum training standards for law-enforcement officers serving as school resource officers. The bill requires the training provided by the Department pursuant to such standards to be specific to the role and responsibility of a law-enforcement officer working with students in a school environment and to be available throughout the Commonwealth. The bill requires each school board to ensure that every public school it supervises employs at least one school administrator who has completed, either in-person or online, school safety training for public school personnel conducted by the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety, unless such training is not available online. This bill is identical to HB 2609.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School resource officers; compulsory minimum training standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1130ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107729D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Landes, VanValkenburg
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Locke, Carrico, Suetterlein
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1130H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106730D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106730D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104359D-ES1
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1130ES1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104359D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateIncorporates SB1551 (Surovell)
2019-01-31SenateIncorporates SB1530 (Deeds)
2019-01-31SenateIncorporates SB1299 (Barker)
2019-01-31SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104359D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2019-01-23SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2019-01-14SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2018-12-29SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-29SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102420D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.10(n/a)See Bill Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1130
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1130ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0488+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0034+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0136+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0238+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0420SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0021+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0198+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3117+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0928SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1130+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3343+SB1130
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1100SB1130+SB1130

Bill Comments

feedback