VA SB1141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family life education; human trafficking. Requires the Board of Education, in its curriculum guidelines for family life education, to include instruction on the prevention of human trafficking. Additionally, the bill requires any high school family life education program offered in a local school division to incorporate age-appropriate elements of effective and evidence-based programs on the prevention of human trafficking.
Title
Family life education; BOE to include instruction on prevention of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 6-N) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1141ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (88-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103321D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 207.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 207.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |