VA SB1142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State School Health Advisory Committee. Requires the Board of Education to establish the State School Health Advisory Committee, consisting of no more than 20 nonlegislative citizen members, to advise the Board, the Governor, and the General Assembly on (i) the role of employees in public elementary or secondary schools in providing health care services at such schools and (ii) the need for any training associated with delivery of health care services.
Title
State School Health Advisory Committee; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100754D |