VA SB1145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Initiative for Employment Not Welfare (VIEW); transitional child care. Allows VIEW participants whose Temporary Assistance for Needy Families financial assistance is terminated to receive child care assistance for up to 12 months after termination if the individual is enrolled in an accredited public institution of higher education or other postsecondary school licensed or certified by the Board of Education or the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia and is taking courses as part of a curriculum that leads to a postsecondary credential, such as a degree or an industry-recognized credential, certification, or license. Under current law, such child care assistance is only available if it enables the individual to work. This bill is identical to HB 1871.
Title
Virginia Initiative for Employment Not Welfare (VIEW); transitional child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 218 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1145ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (85-Y 12-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101901D |