VA SB1153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; job order contracting; limitations. Raises from $5 million to $6 million the maximum allowable sum of all jobs performed in a one-year contract term for job order contracts beginning on July 1, 2019. The bill also provides an exception to allow job order contracting in the case of safety improvements or traffic calming measures for individual job orders up to $250,000, subject to the maximum annual threshold amount as established in the bill. This bill is identical to HB 2071.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; job order contracting, limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1153ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 19101564D-E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19101564D-E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1153E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (7-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101564D |