VA SB116 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
Summary
DMV service charges. Imposes, in addition to any other fee imposed and collected by DMV, a service charge of $5 for any registration renewal carried out in any of its customer service centers, if the transaction is one that can be conducted by mail, telephone, or electronic means. The bill offers a $1 per year discount for each year of a multiyear registration. Finally, the bill allows a driver's license to be issued for up to eight years. This bill incorporates
Title
Motor Vehicles, Department of; service charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 866 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB116ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 7-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB116ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendment (91-Y 8-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (23-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation (May) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-19 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 082950272-ES1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB116ES1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082950272-S1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082950272-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083435272 |
Same As/Similar To
SB512 (Similar To) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB116 |