VA SB1160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credits related to education. Makes changes to the Neighborhood Assistance Act tax credit program, as it relates to educational services, and the Education Improvement Scholarships tax credit program. The bill provides that in making an allocation of credits to neighborhood organizations under the neighborhood assistance program, the Superintendent of Public Instruction shall consider the portion of the organization's total revenues used to support low-income persons and qualified students with disabilities, not just the amount of credits that an organization received for the prior year. The bill also allows certain neighborhood organizations that provide scholastic assistance services, defined as scholastic assistance organizations, to be eligible to receive an allocation of education improvement scholarship tax credits and establishes guidelines for receiving such an allocation. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Income tax credits related to education; neighborhood organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19100581D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1160E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100581D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.20:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |