VA SB1161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expedited review of adverse coverage determinations; cancer patients. Provides that a covered person shall not be required to have exhausted his health carrier's internal appeal process before seeking an external review of an adverse determination regarding coverage of treatment if the treatment is to treat his cancer. The measure provides that a covered person may request an expedited external review if the adverse determination relates to the treatment of a cancer of the covered person. The measure requires health carriers' notices of the right to an external review to notify covered persons of this provision. The bill has an emergency clause and is identical to HB 1915.
Title
Cancer patients; expedited review of adverse coverage determinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840) | |
2019-04-03 | House | Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective 4/3/19) |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1161ER2) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2019-04-03 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2019-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1161ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Title replaced 19106460D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1161H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106460D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106460D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103054D |