VA SB1165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local gas severance tax; sunset date. Extends the sunset date from January 1, 2020, to January 1, 2022, for the local gas severance tax that is dedicated to (i) the local Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund, (ii) the Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Fund, and (iii) water, sewer, and natural gas systems and lines. This bill is identical to HB 2555.
Title
Gas severance tax, local; extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1165ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (81-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102441D |